FL S0494 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the circumstances under which a person is disqualified from receiving compensation under the Victims of Wrongful Incarceration Compensation Act; specifying that a wrongfully incarcerated person who commits no more than one felony that is not a violent felony, rather than a felony law violation, which results in revocation of parole or community supervision is eligible for compensation, etc.
Title
Compensation of Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Chapter No. 2017-120 | |
2017-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 1089 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 393 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (908054) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/21/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0393 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
S0556 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
S0556 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |