FL S0502 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 449 -SJ 731
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 449 -SJ 731
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to requirements for the proposed charter of an annual public fair; providing that the primary objective of a fair association is the holding, conducting, and promoting of public fairs or expositions; providing that a fair association may file its duly approved charter with the Department of State in addition to the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services for notice purposes; providing that certain exemptions are not applicable to taxes imposed under ch. 212, F.S.; providing that certain fair associations are noncommercial activity providers; revising provisions relating to the exemption from certain license taxes and local business taxes for annual public fairs held by a fair association; removing certain limitations on the use of buildings by counties, municipalities, or fair associations, etc.
Title
Public Fairs and Expositions
Sponsors
Senate Agriculture Committee | Senate Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Charles Dean [R] |
Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 449 -SJ 731 | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time -SJ 731 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-22 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-27 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 283 | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-24 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/24/12, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 103 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 45 | |
2011-12-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2011-12-13 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 109 | |
2011-12-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-12-05 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-22 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/11, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-16 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-11-14 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-04 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 11/14/11, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 45 | |
2011-10-10 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 1175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |