FL S0518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2014-226)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2014-226)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising child restraint requirements for children who are of certain age to include a child booster seat; providing exceptions; subjecting a violation to penalties, etc.
Title
Child Safety Devices in Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2014-226) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 225 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/24/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/12/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/06/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0225 (Similar To) 2014-06-24 - Chapter No. 2014-226
S0454 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2014-226)
S0454 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 225 (Ch. 2014-226)