FL S0538 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that state universities and Florida College System institutions are considered authorized entities for specified purposes relating to the emergency use of epinephrine auto-injectors; requiring, rather than authorizing, public schools to purchase or acquire a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors for specified purposes; requiring state universities and Florida College System institutions to purchase or acquire a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Use of Epinephrine Auto-injectors on Public K-20 Campuses
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Education; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H99 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 0963 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |