FL S0540 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain guaranty association employees to adjust losses for the Florida Insurance Guaranty Association if certain conditions are met; redefining the term "net direct written premiums" as "direct written premiums" and revising the definition of that term; deleting a calculation of initial estimated assessments levied by the Office of Insurance Regulation on insurers in the Florida Insurance Guaranty Association; deleting a calculation of initial estimated assessments levied by the office on insurers in the Florida Workers' Compensation Insurance Guaranty Association, etc.
Title
Insurance Guaranty Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#688 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-54 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/22/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H329 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 540 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 914 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |