FL S0560 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "John Anthony Wilson Bicycle Safety Act." Provides for the Department of Environmental Protection to enter into concession agreements for naming rights of state greenway and trail facilities or property or commercial advertising to be displayed on state greenway and trail facilities or property. Provides for distribution of proceeds from such concession agreements.
Title
Sale of Advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/12/11, 9:15 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 339 | |
2011-04-01 | Remaining references corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 355 | |
2011-03-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/22/11, 1:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 49 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/09/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 49 | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0313 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration