FL S0600 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending and repealing provisions to conform to the directive of the Legislature in section 9 of chapter 2012-116, Laws of Florida, codified as section 11.242(5)(j), Florida Statutes, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#405 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13 Chapter No. 2020-4
2020-02-12 Approved by Governor
2020-02-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-02-05SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-01-29HousePassed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-01-29HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-29HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-29HouseSubstituted for HB 7035
2020-01-23HouseReceived
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-23HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-01-22HouseIn Messages
2020-01-22SenateImmediately certified
2020-01-22SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 153
2020-01-22SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-22SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-16SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/22/20
2020-01-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-01-15SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Rules
2019-12-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7035 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 600

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
250115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
260017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback