FL S0604 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception to the requirement that state officers and employees designate a charitable organization to receive contributions from the Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; providing for the distribution of undesignated funds by the fiscal agent; removing the requirement that a local steering committee be established in each fiscal agent area, etc.
Title
Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages |
2014-03-20 | House | In Messages |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/05/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Filed |