FL S0630 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 451 (Ch. 2019-123)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to develop and publish on its website an educational pamphlet regarding the use of nonopioid alternatives for the treatment of pain; requiring that the pamphlet include specified information, including the advantages and disadvantages of the use of such alternatives, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonopioid Alternatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 451 (Ch. 2019-123)
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 451
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-17SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-09SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-08SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-01-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H451 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-123

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback