FL S0630 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Ava's Law"; requiring that every female who is arrested and not released on bond within 72 hours after arrest be administered a pregnancy test within a specified timeframe, upon her request; authorizing a sentencing court to stay the beginning of the period of incarceration for up to a certain timeframe for a pregnant woman convicted of any offense; authorizing a sentencing court to order a pregnant woman to comply with specified terms and conditions during the stay of the incarceration, etc.
Title
Pregnant Women in Custody
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Sen. Shevrin Jones [D] | Sen. Bobby Powell [D] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H363 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
907 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
925 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |