FL S0666 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Office of Financial Regulation to conduct joint or concurrent examinations with other state or federal regulatory agencies; providing additional grounds for disciplinary action against a licensee or person required to be licensed based on certain violations of the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry's Rules of Conduct for Test Takers; deleting certain disclosure requirements relating to mortgage broker agreements; providing additional requirements, fees, and consequences for failing to renew a mortgage lender license that is not submitted by a certain date, etc.
Title
Loan Originators, Mortgage Brokers, and Mortgage Lenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/05/14, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/18/14, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0631 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1012 (Ch. 2014-91)
S1012 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
S1012 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1278 (Ch. 2014-99)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
494 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0079 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00791 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00792 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00794 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00796 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00797 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |