FL S0672 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting health maintenance organizations from excluding coverage for certain cancer treatment drugs; prohibiting health insurers and health maintenance organizations from requiring, before providing prescription drug coverage for the treatment of stage 4 metastatic cancer and associated conditions, that treatment have failed with a different drug; providing applicability, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage for Cancer and Associated Conditions Drug Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-10-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H261 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
H373 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
S820 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6274239Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback