FL S0684 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising public school choice options available to students to include CAPE digital tools, CAPE industry certifications, and collegiate high school programs; requiring each district school board and charter school governing board to authorize a parent to have his or her child participate in controlled open enrollment; requiring the Florida High School Athletic Association to allow a private school to maintain full membership in the association or to join by sport, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Choice in Sports

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
2016-02-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2016-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2016-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-01-27SenateNow in Appropriations
2016-01-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2016-01-20SenateCS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time
2016-01-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-01-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2016-01-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-01-14SenateCS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/14/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-11-18SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-10-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0031 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H0669 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S0886 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1026 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7039 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100620Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012796Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback