FL S0698 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2014-202)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2014-202)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Sexual Misconduct with Students by Authority Figures Act"; providing for reclassification of specified sexual offenses committed against a student by an authority figure; providing for severity ranking of offenses; providing for application of the severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code, etc.
Title
Sexual Misconduct with Students by Authority Figures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2014-202) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 485 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/31/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0485 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-202
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |