FL S0698 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to submit updated retail bag reports with conclusions and recommendations to the Legislature by specified dates; defining the term "coastal community"; authorizing coastal communities to establish pilot programs to regulate single-use plastic products, etc.
Title
Regulation of Single-use Plastic Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Rules |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 7033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/698 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/698/BillText/Filed/HTML |