FL S0788 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring, instead of authorizing, the Department of Transportation to establish a grant program to fund local, regional, and state bicycle and pedestrian projects that support the Safe Paths to Schools Program, etc.
Title
Safe Paths to Schools Program
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/788 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0788/BillText/Filed/HTML |