FL S0800 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporating a portion of St. Lucie County into Martin County; revising the legal description of Martin County; revising the legal description of St. Lucie County, to conform; transferring roads; providing for transition pursuant to an interlocal agreement; providing requirements for such agreement; providing for Martin County to compensate St. Lucie County for certain loss of revenue, etc.
Title
County Boundary Lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#51 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1138 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1138 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1047 | |
2012-03-08 | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (831651) -SJ 1045 | |
2012-03-07 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 2 -HJ 1165 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1165 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1133 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1103 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1103 | |
2012-02-10 | In Messages | |
2012-02-08 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-08 | Read 3rd time -SJ 345 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 323 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/12 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/01/12, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 286 | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/24/12, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | |
2012-01-13 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 161 | |
2012-01-12 | Now in Budget -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 135 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 68 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-11-16 | Referred to Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 68 | |
2011-11-02 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |