FL S0822 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for reclassification of assault or battery offenses committed on certain persons when such persons are engaged in their lawful duties, etc.
Title
Assault or Battery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H113 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0877 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |