FL S0872 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the unlawful killing of a human being when committed by a person engaged in the perpetration of, or in the attempt to perpetrate, the offense of aggravated fleeing or eluding with serious bodily injury or death, is murder of a specified degree, dependent upon certain circumstances; revising provisions of the offense severity ranking chart of the Criminal Punishment Code to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Murder
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 667 | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 775 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-23 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 556 | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Budget -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 01/31/12, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-30 | Now in Budget -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 287 | |
2012-01-26 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-25 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 73 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 73 | |
2011-11-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 0823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 146 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |