FL S0884 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a landlord to offer a tenant the option to pay a fee in lieu of a security deposit; requiring the landlord to provide certain written notice to the tenant; requiring a written agreement signed by the landlord, or the landlord's agent, and the tenant if the tenant decides to pay a fee in lieu of the security deposit; specifying that landlords have exclusive discretion as to whether to offer tenants the option to pay a fee in lieu of a security deposit, etc.
Title
Fees in Lieu of Security Deposits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2022-01-19 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H537 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules