FL S0884 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education, subject to legislative appropriation, to establish a program to provide vouchers for child care services to parents who meet a specified income requirement, etc.
Title
Child Care Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K -12 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/884 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/884/BillText/Filed/HTML |