FL S0886 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to provide that the homestead property tax discount for certain veterans who had permanent, combat-related disabilities carries over to the benefit of the veteran's surviving spouse under certain circumstances until he or she remarries or sells or otherwise disposes of the property, to provide that the discount for the surviving spouse is transferrable to another homestead under certain circumstances, and to provide an effective date, etc.
Title
Homestead Tax Exemption/Surviving Spouse of a Veteran
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S888 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H717 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H719 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H717 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H719 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/886 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/886/BillText/Filed/HTML |