FL S0892 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the criteria allowing a court to sentence as a youthful offender a person who is found guilty of, or who pled nolo contendere or guilty to, committing a felony before the person turned 21 years of age, etc.
Title
Youthful Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-02 | House | In Messages |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/22/17, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
958 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |