FL S0910 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision that required local government measures that imposed rent controls to expire unless they were extended or renewed in accordance with law, etc.
Title
Rent Control Measures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6013 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/910 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/910/BillText/Filed/HTML |