FL S0946 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Enterprise Florida, Inc., to establish a statewide golf trail; requiring Enterprise Florida, Inc., to cooperate with various entities; requiring Enterprise Florida, Inc., to designate a proprietary name for the statewide golf trail; authorizing Enterprise Florida, Inc., to license the name and receive compensation for such licensing; encouraging the donation of public or private golf course property to the state, a local government, or a nonprofit organization for certain purposes; authorizing the owners of golf course property to donate or retain any vested or permitted rights in the property, etc.
Title
Economic Development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation | |
2012-02-08 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 351 | |
2012-02-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 348 | |
2012-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 79 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 79 | |
2011-11-15 | Filed |