FL S0978 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the requirements for property owners to receive a reduction in assessed value of certain homestead properties; revising the maximum value of such reduction; specifying the method for assessing property when conditions are no longer met to receive such reduction, etc.
Title
Reduction of Assessed Value
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S976 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Finance and Tax
H1513 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H1511 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H1513 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
H1511 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee