FL S1006 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring certain individual health insurance policies to provide coverage for hearing aids for children 21 years of age or younger; specifying health care providers who may prescribe, fit, and dispense the hearing aids; specifying a minimum coverage limit within a certain timeframe; providing an exception; providing that an insured is responsible for certain costs that exceed the policy limit, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage for Hearing Aids for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-13SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-21SenateNow in Health Policy
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-11-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H125 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276413Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback