FL S1056 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the task force adjunct to the Department of Environmental Protection; providing the purpose and membership of the task force; requiring the appointees to be experts from specified subject areas, etc.
Title
Florida Disaster Resilience Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1056 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1056/BillText/Filed/HTML |