FL S1090 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that the Energy Economic Zone Program is no longer a pilot program and shall be administered by the Department of Economic Opportunity; deleting a provision that required the department to consult with the Department of Transportation in implementing the program, etc.
Title
Energy Economic Zone Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0887 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1090 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1090/BillText/Filed/HTML |