FL S1108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting requirements that the Department of Health conduct examinations for clinical laboratory personnel licensure and register clinical laboratory trainees; deleting the requirement that the Board of Clinical Laboratory Personnel approve training curricula for licensure of clinical laboratory personnel; requiring that applicants for licensure as a technologist or technician who meet specified criteria be deemed to have satisfied minimum qualifications for licensure, as applicable, etc.
Title
Clinical Laboratory Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Rules |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1313 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
483 | 800 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1108 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1108/BillText/Filed/HTML |