FL S1112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "inventory," for purposes of ad valorem taxation except for school district levies, to include certain construction equipment owned by a heavy equipment rental dealer; increasing the discount under the affordable housing property exemption; renaming the term "mail order sale" as "remote sale" and revising the definition; providing a sales tax refund to an eligible job training organization on its sales of goods donated to the organization, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateCS by Finance and Tax read 1st time
2019-04-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-16SenateCS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-11SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-11SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-02-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1412 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7123
S1642 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
H1377 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H7123 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-42
H23 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-137
H643 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
S1098 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
192001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120596Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212094Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback