FL H0023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing standards of practice for telehealth providers; authorizing certain telehealth providers to use telehealth to prescribe certain controlled substances under specified circumstances; providing registration requirements for out-of-state telehealth providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#287 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#68 (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 41 N: 70 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-04-29HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (845780) 994
2019-04-29HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 30 NAYS 9
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (845780)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1526
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 102 NAYS 14
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendment(s) failed (040721, 195975) 608
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-20HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-19HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2019-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-18HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/18/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Removed from meeting agenda
2019-03-07HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7067 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Ordered enrolled
S1526 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 23
H947 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H7123 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-42
S1112 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/361343/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/040721/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/195975/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/852378/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/895902/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/636418/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Amendment/845780/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Vote/HouseVote_h00023c2049.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Vote/HouseVote_h00023c2068.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Vote/SenateVote_h00023c2004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/23/Vote/HouseVote_h00023c2287.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback