FL S1122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the number of years that such licenses are valid; requiring that certain persons successfully demonstrate firearms proficiency through a specified course to obtain a license; providing course requirements, etc.
Title
Licenses to Carry Concealed Weapons or Firearms
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H753 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1122 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1122/BillText/Filed/HTML |