FL S1124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for district school board policies that authorize commercial advertisements on school buses. Provides policy requirements relating to reimbursement to the school district, prohibited advertisements, and signage and equipment standards. Requires a school bus to be withdrawn from use under certain circumstances. Provides for the remittance and allocation of revenue.
Title
Public School Buses
Sponsors
Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] | Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Senate Transportation Committee |
Sen. Stephen Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 481 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/12/11, 9:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Transportation -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 83 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Transportation; Budget -SJ 84 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0109 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration