FL S1124 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the criteria a state agency must consider before denying a license, permit, or certification to a person previously convicted of a crime; requiring a state agency to consider specified factors when determining if an ex-offender applying for a license, permit, or certification has not been rehabilitated; authorizing certain persons to petition a state agency to determine whether their criminal record disqualifies them from obtaining a license, permit, or certification; requiring specified agencies to submit an annual report to the Governor and the Legislature, etc.
Title
Employment of Ex-offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice |
2023-03-23 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H489 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1028 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1443 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
S1028 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1443 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
455 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 554 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |