FL S1134 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Genetic Counseling Patient Protection Act"; providing licensure, licensure renewal, and continuing education requirements; requiring the Department of Health to adopt by rule continuing education requirements; authorizing the department to enter an order denying licensure or imposing other penalties for certain violations; revising the definition of the term "health care practitioner" to include licensed genetic counselors, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetic Counseling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H911 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483912Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
483918Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback