FL S1184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Schools of Innovation; authorizing a school district to apply to the Commissioner of Education to designate a public school as a School of Innovation; authorizing a School of Innovation to request the state board to waive rules or the district school board to waive policies; authorizing a School of Innovation to use an alternative to letter grades; requiring the department to determine and implement an equitable method of equivalent funding for Schools of Innovation, etc.
Title
Schools of Innovation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H907 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1184 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1184/BillText/Filed/HTML |