FL S1186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Second Chance for Children Act"; providing that a juvenile offender who was 17 years of age or younger at the time of committing a nonhomicide offense and who was sentenced to 10 or more years of imprisonment may be eligible for a reduced or suspended sentence; setting forth the eligibility criteria for the court to reduce or suspend a sentence; requiring that the juvenile offender participate in any available reentry program for a specified period following release, etc.
Title
Reducing or Suspending the Sentence of a Juvenile Offender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0963 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S0998 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S0998 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1186 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1186/BillText/Filed/HTML |