FL S1282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an authority to provide a rebate for certain tolls paid using an electronic toll collection system; requiring transfer of a certain amount of toll revenue from an authority to a county for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Expressway Authority Toll Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/28/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H961 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182)
S1562 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182)
H1049 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-182
S1562 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1049 (Ch. 2017-182)
H1049 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-182
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1282 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1282/BillText/Filed/HTML |