FL S1286 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that an emergency medical technician or paramedic or radiologic technologist who is certified or has applied to be certified may be subject to a treatment program for impaired practitioners at the election of the impaired practitioner consultant; exempting an entity retained by the Department of Health as an impaired practitioner consultant from certain licensing requirements if the entity employs or contracts with licensed professionals; limiting the liability of certain medical schools and schools that prepare health care practitioners and veterinarians for licensure for referring a student to an impaired practitioner consultant, etc.
Title
Treatment Programs for Impaired Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-03-08 | In Messages | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1000 | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1000 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 805 | |
2012-02-29 | Now in Budget -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-22 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 674 | |
2012-02-16 | Now in Budget -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/16/12, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time -SJ 333 | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/02/12, 3:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 141 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 141 | |
2011-12-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |