FL S1324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Health to require the payment of specified fees relating to the registration of and the operating licenses, facility permits, and vehicle permits for medical marijuana treatment centers (MMTCs); authorizing the department to refuse to issue or renew an operating license or facility permit of an MMTC that has failed to pay an application or renewal fee, etc.
Title
Fees/Medical Marijuana Treatment Centers/Department of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1322 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 182 (Ch. 2019-1)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1324 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1324/BillText/Filed/HTML |