FL S1342 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, for IV-D cases, an affidavit filed with a child support depository requesting that child support payments be made through the depository need not allege a default in support payments; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to reinstate an obligor's driving privileges if the obligor is paying his or her support obligation by income deduction order or is receiving unemployment compensation, social security disability payments, supplemental security income, or temporary cash assistance; adding a caregiver to the list of persons who may provide a statement regarding a putative father; providing that the Department of Revenue rather than the director of the state IV-D program may cause a lien to be placed on a motor vehicle and vessel, etc.
Title
Child Support Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget | |
2012-02-29 | Now in Budget -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 721 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-21 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time -SJ 538 | |
2012-02-21 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 534 | |
2012-02-17 | Now in Budget -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-16 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/16/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-13 | Now in Banking and Insurance -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable with 2 amendment(s) by Transportation (202046, 682354); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-23 | Now in Transportation -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 264 | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced -SJ 145 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/19/12, 10:15 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 145 | |
2011-12-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2563 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 25656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 25658 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 2575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |