FL S1368 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the tax for certain common area maintenance charges; defining the term "common area maintenance charges"; providing that such charges do not include certain maintenance or repair costs required to be capitalized for federal tax purposes, etc.
Title
Tax on Real Property Rental and License Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1368 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1368/BillText/Filed/HTML |