FL S1418 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring service providers to disclose information from a clinical record under certain circumstances relating to threats to cause serious bodily injury or death; requiring psychiatrists to disclose certain patient communications for purposes of notifying law enforcement agencies of certain threats; revising responsibilities of the Department of Education and the Statewide Office for Suicide Prevention, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#328 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 560
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-18SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-17SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-03SenateRemaining references corrected to Rules
2019-04-03SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S838 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H361 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
H363 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S7048 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012583Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944785Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394499Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4900147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback