FL H0361 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires service providers to disclose information from clinical record relating to threats; revises deadlines for submission of documentation regarding involuntary examinations; revises purpose of civil commitment of sexually violent predators; revises responsibilities of DOE & Statewide Office for Suicide Prevention; revises criteria for designation as Certified Suicide Prevention School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-03HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/02/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-20HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-18HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H363 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S838 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-51
S1418 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Ordered enrolled
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S7048 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012583Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944785Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394499Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394917Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4900147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback