FL S1506 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring district water management plans for districts including Outstanding Florida Springs to include certain maximum sustainable groundwater withdrawal estimates; revising the criteria for determining whether certain water supply development projects are given first consideration for funding assistance to include consideration of whether a project maximizes water conservation, etc.
Title
Water Management
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1506 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1506/BillText/Filed/HTML |