FL S1530 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision relating to state, state university, and community college employee lobbyists; prohibiting certain public service announcements by specified governmental entities, persons acting on behalf of such entities, and elected officials; revising applicability of certain provisions relating to conflicting employment and contractual relationships; prohibiting public officers or employees of an agency from soliciting specified employment or contractual relationships, etc.
Title
Ethics Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1185 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1530 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1530/BillText/Filed/HTML |