FL S1562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an agency from entering into or renewing a contract for goods or services with a company that is domiciled in a state or territory that enacts legislation establishing restrictions on abortion in violation of United States Supreme Court precedent; specifying conditions upon which legislation is deemed to be in violation of Supreme Court precedent; requiring contracts entered into or renewed on or after a specified date to authorize immediate termination of the contract if certain conditions exist, etc.
Title
State Contracting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1562 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1562/BillText/Filed/HTML |