FL S1608 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Financial Services to contract with a nonprofit coordinating entity for certain services; providing for carry forward of a certain amount of unexpended state funds; requiring that expenditures of such funds be reported to the department, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for Nonprofit Coordinating Entities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98425Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback