FL S1624 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1103 (Ch. 2021-226)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1103 (Ch. 2021-226)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain independent special districts to contract with an independent entity to conduct performance audits; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to conduct performance audits of certain classifications of independent special districts; requiring the performance audits to be reported by a time certain; requiring that certain data be included in financial audits of special districts, etc.
Title
Special District Accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1103 (Ch. 2021-226) |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1103 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/21 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1103 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-226
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
189 | 0695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |